U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:24-cv-00033
  • Case Name: Belcastro Gonzalez v. City of Omaha et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
October, 2024
  • October 23, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
  • October 14, 2024: [Index]
  • October 14, 2024: [Brief]
  • October 14, 2024: [Compel]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • October 11, 2024: [Strike]
  • October 09, 2024: [Extend]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.