U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cv-03150
  • Case Name: North Fork Wind, LLC et al v. Knox County, Nebraska et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case (NEW)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 17, 2025: [Restricted Case Conference Instructions - WebEx]
  • March 17, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 09, 2024: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.