U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:24-cv-00398
  • Case Name: Hofer v. Bennington Public School District
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 30, 2025: [Reply Brief]
  • April 17, 2025: [Extend]
  • April 15, 2025: [Brief]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 09, 2025: [Extend]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Brief]
  • March 20, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
January, 2025
  • January 01, 2025: [Brief]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Assignment of Judges]
  • October 10, 2024: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.