U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:24-cr-00085-9
  • Case Name: USA v. Amenta-Aguilar et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Final or Preliminary Forfeiture]
  • April 17, 2025: [Final or Preliminary Forfeiture]
  • April 16, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 16, 2025: [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Sentencing Schedule]
  • April 16, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Adoption of/Statement regarding Presentence Report]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 17, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 14, 2025: [Continue]
December, 2024
  • December 12, 2024: [Continue]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 11, 2024: [Oral]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • October 11, 2024: [Petition regarding Conditions of Pretrial Release - SEALED]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.