U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:24-cr-00145-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kessel
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Receipt (Other)]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Final or Preliminary Forfeiture]
  • April 22, 2025: [Final or Preliminary Forfeiture]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Criminal Case]
  • April 16, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Plea and Plea Agreement Accepted]
  • April 11, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 11, 2024: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.