U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-cr-03059-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Timothy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Sentencing Schedule]
  • April 16, 2025: [Witness List]
  • April 16, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • April 16, 2025: [Non-Jury Trial - Ended]
  • April 15, 2025: [Non-Jury Trial - Held]
  • April 14, 2025: [Non-Jury Trial - Began]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order - Text Only]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 10, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Proposed Exhibit List]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Restrict pursuant to E-Goverment Act]
  • April 04, 2025: [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • April 04, 2025: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Proposed Exhibit List]
  • April 04, 2025: [Index]
  • April 04, 2025: [Proposed Witness List]
  • April 04, 2025: [In Limine]
  • April 04, 2025: [Brief]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • April 02, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset All Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Waiver]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • March 24, 2025: [Trial Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • March 24, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Transcript - Unredacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.