U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-03066-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Martinez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • May 01, 2025: [Audio File]
  • May 01, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • May 01, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Restricted Motion pursuant to E-Government Act]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Restricted Hearing Instructions and Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Restrict pursuant to E-Goverment Act]
  • April 25, 2025: [Restricted Motion Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • April 25, 2025: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Restricted Order Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • April 03, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Audio File]
  • April 02, 2025: [Witness List]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Review]
  • April 02, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • March 27, 2025: [Restricted Motion Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Restrict pursuant to E-Goverment Act]
  • March 27, 2025: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
  • March 27, 2025: [Restricted Hearing Instructions and Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Review]
October, 2024
  • October 17, 2024: [Brief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.