U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:23-cv-00404
  • Case Name: Millard Gutter Company v. Safeco Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Audio File - Restricted]
  • May 02, 2025: [Restricted Order Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • May 02, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order - Text Only]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset All Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2024
  • December 04, 2024: [Disclosure Document]
October, 2024
  • October 23, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.