U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-03092-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thurman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Objection to Findings and Recommendation]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 23, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 09, 2025: [Findings and Recommendation]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Brief]
November, 2024
  • November 06, 2024: [Audio File]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.