U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:24-cv-00375
  • Case Name: Mark v. Jeffreys
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Memorandum and Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Pro Se Case Management Deadlines]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Objection]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Pro Se Case Management Deadlines]
  • March 20, 2025: [Response]
  • March 20, 2025: [Letter]
January, 2025
  • January 03, 2025: [Reassignment Order]
December, 2024
  • December 23, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.