U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:24-cr-00058-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cummings
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Criminal Case]
  • April 09, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Plea and Plea Agreement Accepted]
  • April 08, 2025: [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • April 08, 2025: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • April 07, 2025: [Seal (Motion for Permission to Seal)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 07, 2025: [Adoption of/Statement regarding Presentence Report]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Restrict pursuant to E-Goverment Act]
  • March 24, 2025: [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • March 24, 2025: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
January, 2025
  • January 13, 2025: [Order on Sentencing Schedule]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.