U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:25-cr-00017-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Reyes-Andrade et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 21, 2025: [Extend]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order - Text Only]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 12, 2025: [Withdraw Document]
  • April 09, 2025: [Restricted Hearing Instructions and Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [Brief]
  • April 08, 2025: [Suppress]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 04, 2025: [Extend]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order of Detention]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Audio File]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • March 31, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 31, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 31, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 27, 2025: [Restricted Hearing Instructions and Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2025
  • February 02, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.