U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:24-cr-00034-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Mendoza-Aguilar et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Final or Preliminary Forfeiture]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Final or Preliminary Forfeiture]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 26, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure/Variance]
  • March 26, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Plea and Plea Agreement Accepted]
  • March 24, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 24, 2025: [Adoption of/Statement regarding Presentence Report]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Restrict pursuant to E-Goverment Act]
  • March 19, 2025: [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • March 19, 2025: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Downward Departure/Variance]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.