U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-03023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garcia-Urquizo et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 18, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 17, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 16, 2025: [Extend]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 14, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 10, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 04, 2025: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Arraignment/Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Restricted Hearing Instructions and Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Audio File]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 02, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 28, 2025: [Restricted Hearing Instructions and Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Restricted Order Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 28, 2025: [Audio File]
  • March 28, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 28, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 28, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 27, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 27, 2025: [Consular Notification]
  • March 27, 2025: [Restricted Hearing Instructions and Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Restricted Order Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 27, 2025: [Audio File]
  • March 27, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 27, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 27, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 27, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 26, 2025: [Remark - Public (Related Case)]
  • March 26, 2025: [Add Counts]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 26, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Prosequendum]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Unsealing]
  • March 26, 2025: [Remark - Public]
  • March 26, 2025: [Restricted Hearing Instructions and Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 11, 2025: [Extend]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.