U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-03087-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dominguez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 22, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
  • April 14, 2025: [Brief]
  • April 14, 2025: [Sever]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 20, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.