U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-03026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Simmons
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 15, 2025: [Extend]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 26, 2025: [Restricted Order Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • March 26, 2025: [Audio File]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • March 26, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 26, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 26, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 13, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.