U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:25-cb-00003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Huffaker et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Audio File]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 28, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Report - CVB]
  • March 25, 2025: [Central Violations Bureau Updated Docket Sheet]
  • March 25, 2025: [Audio File]
  • March 25, 2025: [Minutes - CVB]
  • March 17, 2025: [Report - CVB]
  • March 13, 2025: [Central Violations Bureau Docket Sheet and Tickets]
  • March 13, 2025: [Disclaimer - CVB]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.