U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cv-03002
  • Case Name: Butler v. Deputy Jeffers et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Reply]
  • April 14, 2025: [Disclosure Document]
  • April 10, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 10, 2025: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • April 09, 2025: [Memorandum and Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Strike Order]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 18, 2025: [Reassignment Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order - Text Only]
  • March 14, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 14, 2025: [Memorandum and Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Pro Se Case Management Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.