U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cv-03061
  • Case Name: Golonka v. Union Pacific Railroad Co.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case (NEW)]
  • May 08, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order - Consent (TEXT ONLY)]
  • May 07, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Restricted Case Conference Instructions]
  • April 09, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 17, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 17, 2025: [Assignment of Judges]
  • March 14, 2025: [Summons Requested]
  • March 14, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.