U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-03028-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Barriente
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Sentencing Schedule]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 24, 2025: [Restricted Order Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • March 24, 2025: [Waiver]
  • March 19, 2025: [Criminal Cover Sheet - Amended]
  • March 18, 2025: [Forepersons Signature Page]
  • March 18, 2025: [Criminal Cover Sheet]
  • March 18, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.