U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:24-cr-00035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Maciel
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Criminal Case]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure/Variance]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Plea and Plea Agreement Accepted]
  • April 10, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 08, 2025: [Adoption of/Statement regarding Presentence Report]
  • April 08, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Return of Service]
  • March 26, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Restrict pursuant to E-Goverment Act]
  • March 18, 2025: [Restricted Motion Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • March 18, 2025: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
  • March 18, 2025: [Downward Departure/Variance]
  • March 18, 2025: [Adoption of/Statement regarding Presentence Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.