U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:25-cr-00060-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mejia
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Sentencing Schedule]
  • April 10, 2025: [Trial Order]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Remark - Public (Related Case)]
  • March 18, 2025: [Criminal Cover Sheet]
  • March 18, 2025: [Forepersons Signature Page]
  • March 18, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.