U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:25-cr-00050-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gabino-Maganda
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Sentencing Schedule]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 10, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 24, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 21, 2025: [Audio File]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • March 21, 2025: [Consular Notification]
  • March 21, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 21, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 21, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 19, 2025: [Interpreter Request for Pretrial Hearings (TEXT ONLY)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • March 18, 2025: [Criminal Cover Sheet]
  • March 18, 2025: [Forepersons Signature Page]
  • March 18, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.