U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:25-cr-00058-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dortch et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 29, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 24, 2025: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Arraignment/Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Criminal Cover Sheet]
  • April 22, 2025: [Forepersons Signature Page]
  • April 22, 2025: [Superseding Indictment]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 07, 2025: [Extend]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Audio File]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 25, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 25, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 18, 2025: [Remark - Public]
  • March 18, 2025: [Criminal Cover Sheet]
  • March 18, 2025: [Forepersons Signature Page]
  • March 18, 2025: [Indictment]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.