U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-03031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hunter
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 07, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 03, 2025: [Audio File]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion to Review]
  • April 03, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Restricted Hearing Instructions and Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Review]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 21, 2025: [Audio File]
  • March 21, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: [Restricted Hearing Instructions and Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Restricted Order Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 20, 2025: [Audio File]
  • March 20, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 20, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 19, 2025: [Restricted Hearing Instructions and Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 19, 2025: [Remark - Public]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Unsealing]
  • March 18, 2025: [Criminal Cover Sheet]
  • March 18, 2025: [Indictment]
  • March 18, 2025: [Forepersons Signature Page]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.