U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:25-cr-00066-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Choquette
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 24, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 24, 2025: [Strike Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • March 21, 2025: [Audio File]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 21, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 21, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 21, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • March 20, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Unsealing]
  • March 20, 2025: [Remark - Public]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.