U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:25-cr-00069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Watkins
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extend]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Audio File]
  • March 27, 2025: [Strike Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 27, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: [Audio File]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • March 24, 2025: [Oral]
  • March 24, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 24, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Unsealing]
  • March 21, 2025: [Remark - Public]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.