U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:25-cr-00067-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Niess
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 28, 2025: [Extend]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extend]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 24, 2025: [Audio File]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 24, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 24, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • March 21, 2025: [Remark - Public]
  • March 21, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Unsealing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.