U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:25-cr-00070-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perdomo et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 15, 2025: [Extend]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 27, 2025: [Interpreter Request for Pretrial Hearings (TEXT ONLY)]
  • March 26, 2025: [Audio File]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 26, 2025: [Consular Notification]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • March 26, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 26, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 26, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 26, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 25, 2025: [Interpreter Request for Pretrial Hearings (TEXT ONLY)]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • March 21, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 21, 2025: [Remark - Public]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Unsealing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.