U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:24-cr-00138-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nyuon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 27, 2025: [Transcript - Unredacted]
  • April 18, 2025: [Audio File]
  • April 18, 2025: [Letter by Clerk - Transcriber]
  • April 18, 2025: [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Sentencing Schedule]
  • April 18, 2025: [Findings and Recommendation on Guilty Plea]
  • April 18, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Audio File]
  • March 21, 2025: [Strike Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Status Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.