U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:25-cv-00208
  • Case Name: Glover v. Elevate Property Management et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Reply Brief]
  • April 08, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
  • April 07, 2025: [Brief]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
  • March 28, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
  • March 26, 2025: [Remark - Public]
  • March 24, 2025: [Reassignment Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Brief]
  • March 24, 2025: [Remand]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 24, 2025: [Assignment of Judges]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.