U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:25-cr-00063-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McCoy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 25, 2025: [Audio File]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • March 25, 2025: [Oral]
  • March 25, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • March 25, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 25, 2025: [Reassignment Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Unsealing]
  • March 24, 2025: [Remark - Public]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.