U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:24-cr-00101-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Monarrez-Zazueta et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 04, 2025: [Proposed Witness List]
  • April 04, 2025: [Proposed Exhibit List]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Restrict pursuant to E-Goverment Act]
  • April 04, 2025: [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • April 04, 2025: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Adoption of/Statement regarding Presentence Report]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 27, 2025: [Extend]
  • March 27, 2025: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.