U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:23-cr-00154-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Banfield
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 18, 2025: [Audio File]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (MJs Only)]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 17, 2025: [Petition for Offender Under Supervision (Prob 12C)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 27, 2025: [Petition for Offender Under Supervision (Prob 12C)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.