U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:25-mj-00213-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hernandez Lopez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Remark - Public]
  • April 07, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 04, 2025: [Audio File]
  • April 04, 2025: [Consular Notification]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 04, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 03, 2025: [Interpreter Request for Pretrial Hearings (TEXT ONLY)]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 02, 2025: [Criminal Cover Sheet]
  • April 02, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.