U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:25-cv-00259
  • Case Name: Grandview Estates Condominium Association v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 30, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 28, 2025: [Response]
  • April 28, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 23, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 21, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 14, 2025: [Brief]
  • April 14, 2025: [Index]
  • April 14, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 07, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
  • April 07, 2025: [Attachment - Continued]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.