U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-80314-
  • Case Name: Doris Yvonne Davis
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Pay Advice]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Schedule Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Schedule J]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Schedule I]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Schedule H]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Schedule G]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Schedule E/F]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Schedule D]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Schedule C]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Schedule A/B]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.