U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:25-cr-00065-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Stevenson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 16, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 15, 2025: [Audio File]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • April 15, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 15, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 15, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 10, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 09, 2025: [Audio File]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • April 09, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 09, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Oral]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.