U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-80318-
  • Case Name: Matt Austin Dillingham and Rebecca Sue Dillingham
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Certificate of Service of EMPLOYER TO PAY TRUSTEE (batch)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Pay Advice]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Clerks Evidence of Repeat Filing]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Objection to Confirmation Deadline Updated (ADI)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Support Document]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Chapter 13 Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.