U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-80315-
  • Case Name: Dee Anna Jensen
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Amended Schedules/Statements]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Certificate of Service of EMPLOYER TO PAY TRUSTEE (batch)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Clerks Evidence of Repeat Filing]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Objection to Confirmation Deadline Updated (ADI)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.