U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40180-
  • Case Name: Hiram N Ramos Silva
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Terminate Deadline]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Acknowledgment of Claim (batch)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Response]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.