U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-80328
  • Case Name: Tiffany Lynn Reikofski
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Notice of Failure to Pay Filing Fee]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Clerks Evidence of Repeat Filing]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Pay Advice]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 [Pay Advice]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.