U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-80323-
  • Case Name: Samantha Jean Bitzinger
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Certificate of Service of DEBTOR TO PAY TRUSTEE (batch)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Certificate Regarding Confirmation Chapter 12/13]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Schedule Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Schedule J]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Schedule I]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Schedule H]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Schedule G]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Schedule E/F]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Schedule D]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Schedule C]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Schedule A/B]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Objection to Confirmation Deadline Updated (ADI)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.