U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:25-mj-00237-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lamadrid Campuzano
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Remark - Public]
  • April 15, 2025: [Audio File]
  • April 15, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • April 15, 2025: [Witness List]
  • April 15, 2025: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 14, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 11, 2025: [Consular Notification]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 11, 2025: [Audio File]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 11, 2025: [Daubert Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 10, 2025: [Criminal Cover Sheet]
  • April 10, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.