U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:23-cr-00094-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fuller
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Audio File]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (MJs Only)]
  • April 29, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 29, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 21, 2025: [Petition for Offender Under Supervision (Prob 12C)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.