U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40343
  • Case Name: Carol Joyce Hall and Larry Marvin Hall
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Waiver of Credit Counseling]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Have the Filing Fee Waived]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Matrix]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Waiver of Credit Counseling]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Courts Certificate Of Mailing]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Amended Order]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Credit Counseling]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Matrix]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Notice of Failure to Pay Filing Fee]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Add Judge]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Add Judge]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 - Case Upload]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor (Caseupload)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 - Case Upload]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor (Caseupload)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.