U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40335-
  • Case Name: Sabine Anne Marks
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Creditor Request for Notice]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Certificate Regarding Confirmation Chapter 12/13]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Certificate of Service of EMPLOYER TO PAY TRUSTEE (batch)]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Objection to Confirmation Deadline Updated (ADI)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Pay Advice]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.