U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-80979-
  • Case Name: Melissa Marie Portillo
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Certificate of Service]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Administrative Order Text Only]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Stipulation]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Relief from Stay]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Resistance]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Certificate of Service]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Hearing Set]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Relief from Stay]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.