U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-80339-
  • Case Name: Connie L Daggett
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Creditor Request for Notice]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Objection to Confirmation Deadline Updated (ADI)]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Pay Advice]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCartney, Erin [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.