U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-80338-
  • Case Name: LaToya Marie Greer
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Pay Advice]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Statement of Intent]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Schedule J]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Schedule I]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Schedule H]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Schedule G]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Schedule E/F]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Schedule D]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Schedule C]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Schedule A/B]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Schedule Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Creditor Request for Notice (No PDF Required)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.